EP0416028 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR RECOVERING ACIDIC GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERR-MCGEE CHEMICAL CORPORATION Kerr-McGee Center Oklahoma City, OK 73125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states KERR-McGEE CHEMICAL CORPORATION Kerr-McGee Center Oklahoma City, OK 73125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGGS, Olen, L., Jr. 1216 Anita Avenue Oklahoma City, OK 73127 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 89906990.0 | 24.04.1989 | [1991/11] | WO1989US01706 | Priority number, date | US19880190838 | 06.05.1988 Original published format: US 190838 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910783 | Date: | 16.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416028 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416028 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/34, C01B31/20 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/1456 (EP,US);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZURÜCKGEWINNUNG VON SAUREN GASEN | [1991/11] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR RECOVERING ACIDIC GASES | [1991/11] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE RECUPERATION DE GAZ ACIDES | [1991/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0052329 [ ] (BETHLEHEM STEEL CORP [US]); | EP0148607 [ ] (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | FR2328657 [ ] (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]); | US2544564 [ ] (PETERSON IVAN A, et al) | Examination | - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 4, 3rd ed. (1978), p. 730 and figure 2, pp. 734, 735 (Girbotol Amine Process) |