EP0417199 - PROTECTIVE BODY APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STROCK, Alvin E. 647 Commonwealth Avenue Newton Center, MA 02159 / US | [1991/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Endlich, Fritz Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Endlich, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907031.2 | 01.06.1989 | [1991/12] | WO1989US02394 | Priority number, date | US19880201170 | 02.06.1988 Original published format: US 201170 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911844 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417199 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F15/00 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
A41D13/0556 (EP,US);
A41D13/05 (EP,US);
A41D13/0506 (EP,US);
A61F15/008 (EP,US);
A41D13/0153 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1233 (EP);
A63B2208/12 (EP);
A63B2209/00 (EP);
A63B2209/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | KÖRPERSCHUTZ-VORRICHTUNG | [1991/12] | English: | PROTECTIVE BODY APPLIANCE | [1991/12] | French: | ACCESSOIRE CORPOREL PROTECTEUR | [1991/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | CH269938 [ ] (BALAGUER JOSE SERRA [ES]); | US4000737 [ ] (HORN CLIFFORD V); | US4134399 [ ] (HALDERSON ALFRED) |