EP0423162 - SURVEYING SYSTEM WITH AN ELECTRO-OPTICAL TOTAL STATION AND A MOBILE RECEIVER STATION OF A SATELLITE POSITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Heerbrugg AG CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [1991/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGENSAND, Hilmar Zehntfeldstrasse 21 CH-9443 Widnau / CH | 02 /
FREI, Erwin Augiessenstrasse 14b CH-9443 Widnau / CH | 03 /
SCHERRER, René Bruggwaldstrasse 60 CH-9008 St. Gallen / CH | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Stamer, Harald c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH Konzernstelle Patente + Marken Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Stamer, Harald, Dipl.-Phys. c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20 D-35530 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907140.1 | 20.06.1989 | [1991/17] | WO1989EP00691 | Priority number, date | CH19880002570 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: CH 257088 | [1991/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000719 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423162 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423162 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
G01C15/00 (EP);
G01S19/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | VERMESSUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER ELEKTROOPTISCHEN TOTALSTATION UND EINER MOBILEN EMPFANGSSTATION EINES SATELLITEN-POSITIONSMESS-SYSTEMS | [1991/17] | English: | SURVEYING SYSTEM WITH AN ELECTRO-OPTICAL TOTAL STATION AND A MOBILE RECEIVER STATION OF A SATELLITE POSITIONING SYSTEM | [1991/17] | French: | SYSTEME GEODESIQUE AVEC UNE STATION ELECTROOPTIQUE TOTALE ET UNE STATION MOBILE DE RECEPTION POUR SYSTEMES DE POSITIONNEMENT DE SATELLITES | [1991/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - Microwave Journal, Band 29, Nr. 4, April 1986, (Dedham, Massachusetts, US), M.R. STIGLITZ: "The Global Positioning System" seiten 34-36,38,42,44,46,50,52,54,56-59 | [ ] - Hewlett-Packard Journal, Band 31, Nr. 9, September 1980 (Palo-Alto, California, US), A.F. GORT: "A Fully Integrated, Microprocessor-Controlled Total Station", seiten 3-11 |