EP0412162 - ELECTROGRAPHIC IMAGE CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAZENKOV, Boris Afanasievich pr. Metallistov, 82-107 Leningrad, 105268 / SU | For all designated states KACHANOV, Evgeny Grigorievich pr. Lenina, 11-48 Vladimirkaya obl Kovrov 601900 / SU | For all designated states EVSTROPOV, Alexandr Nikolaevich ul. Ransheva, 11-14 Vladimirkaya obl Kovrov 601916 / SU | For all designated states ARTOBOLEVSKAYA, Elena Sergeevna ul. Korablestroitelei, 46-402 Leningrad, 199155 / SU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states TAZENKOV, Boris Afanasievich pr. Metallistov, 82-107 Leningrad, 105268 / SU | ||
For all designated states KACHANOV, Evgeny Grigorievich pr. Lenina, 11-48 Vladimirkaya obl Kovrov 601900 / SU | |||
For all designated states EVSTROPOV, Alexandr Nikolaevich ul. Ransheva, 11-14 Vladimirkaya obl Kovrov 601916 / SU | |||
For all designated states ARTOBOLEVSKAYA, Elena Sergeevna ul. Korablestroitelei, 46-402 Leningrad, 199155 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907876.0 | 24.02.1989 | [1991/07] | WO1989SU00051 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010256 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412162 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 07.09.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/14 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
G03G5/102 (EP);
G03G5/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHER AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER | [1991/07] | English: | ELECTROGRAPHIC IMAGE CARRIER | [1991/07] | French: | SUPPORT D'IMAGE ELECTROGRAPHIQUE | [1991/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1990 | Translation filed | 23.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.1990 | Search fee paid | 23.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 28.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2337386 ; | [A]DE2363738 | International search | [A]DE1597877 ; | [A]DE3621270 ; | [A]GB1494637 ; | [A]GB1470403 ; | [A]US2901349 ; | [A]US2809294 |