EP0374244 - AN IMPROVED METHOD OF FABRICATING CONTACTS FOR SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL SOLAR ENERGY CORPORATION Middlesex Technology Center 4 Suburban Park Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANOKA, Jack, I. 107 York Terrace Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89907945.3 | 22.05.1989 | [1990/26] | WO1989US02241 | Priority number, date | US19880205304 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: US 205304 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912321 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374244 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374244 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, H01L31/00 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP);
H01L27/14 (KR);
H01L31/1804 (EP);
Y02E10/547 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SONNENZELLENKONTAKTEN | [1990/26] | English: | AN IMPROVED METHOD OF FABRICATING CONTACTS FOR SOLAR CELLS | [1990/26] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE FABRICATION DE CONTACTS POUR CELLULES SOLAIRES | [1990/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1990 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.12.1994 | [1995/29] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4235644 (NEEDES CHRISTOPHER R [US]); | [A]US4256513 (YOSHIDA MANABU, et al); | [A]US4602120 (WAKEFIELD G FELIX [US], et al); | [X]US4643913 (OKUNAKA MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4737197 (NAGAHARA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) | Examination | US4375007 | - Hybrid Circuit Design and Manufacture, R.D. Jones, M. Dekker, Inc., N. York, 1982 |