EP0483132 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COLOR CORRECTED REPRODUCTION OF COLOURED ORIGINAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F & S CORPORATION OF COLUMBUS, GEORGIA Rt. 1, Box 992, Old Smith Road Fortson, GA 31808 / US | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, Fred, P. Rt. 1, Box 992 Old Smith Road Fortson, GA 31808 / US | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89908030.3 | 26.06.1989 | [1992/19] | WO1989US02839 | Priority number, date | US19880212714 | 28.06.1988 Original published format: US 212714 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000267 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483132 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483132 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F3/10 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H04N1/6025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FARBKORRIGIERTEN WIEDERGABE VON FARBORIGINALBILDERN | [1992/19] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING COLOR CORRECTED REPRODUCTION OF COLOURED ORIGINAL IMAGES | [1992/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION A COULEURS CORRIGEES D'IMAGES ORIGINALES COLOREES | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.1991 | 30.06.1996 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.1997 | CH | 20.08.1997 | IT | 20.08.1997 | LI | 20.08.1997 | NL | 20.08.1997 | SE | 20.11.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 20.08.1997 | |
CH | 20.08.1997 | ||
IT | 20.08.1997 | ||
LI | 20.08.1997 | ||
NL | 20.08.1997 | ||
SE | 20.11.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.08.1997 | |
CH | 20.08.1997 | ||
IT | 20.08.1997 | ||
LI | 20.08.1997 | ||
SE | 20.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 20.08.1997 | |
CH | 20.08.1997 | ||
LI | 20.08.1997 | ||
SE | 20.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.08.1997 | |
SE | 20.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05735475 ; | [A]JPS60249470 ; | [A]WO8000753 (BURDA VERWALTUNGS KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0144188 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [AP]EP0273398 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [AP] 1,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820612), vol. 6, no. 103, Database accession no. (E - 112)<981>, & JP5735475 A 19820226 (CANON KK) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860426), vol. 10, no. 113, Database accession no. (E - 399), & JP60249470 A 19851210 (ISHIDA YOSHIHIRO ET AL) [A] 1,11 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4060829 (SAKAMOTO TAKASHI); | [Y]US4468692 (YAMADA MITSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4482917 (GAULKE WERNER [DE], et al); | [A]US4564859 (KNOP HANS-GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US4639770 (JUNG EGGERT [DE], et al); | [A]US4680596 (LOGAN DAVID J [US]); | [A]US4683492 (SUGIURA SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [AP]US4819193 (IMAO KAORU [JP]) | Examination | US4060829 | US4468692 | US4482917 | US4564859 | US4639770 | US4680596 | US4683492 | US4819193 |