EP0424451 - LADDER LEVELLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLARKE, James Brian 120 Shepherds Hill Harold Wood Essex RM3 0NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states CLARKE, James Brian 120 Shepherds Hill Harold Wood Essex RM3 0NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908453.7 | 06.07.1989 | [1991/18] | WO1989GB00767 | Priority number, date | GB19880016599 | 13.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8816599 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000665 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424451 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424451 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06C7/44 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
E06C7/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LEITERN | [1991/18] | English: | LADDER LEVELLING DEVICE | [1991/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE A NIVEAU D'UNE ECHELLE | [1991/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.02.1993 | BE | 10.02.1993 | CH | 10.02.1993 | DE | 10.02.1993 | FR | 10.02.1993 | IT | 10.02.1993 | LI | 10.02.1993 | NL | 10.02.1993 | SE | 10.02.1993 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
BE | 10.02.1993 | ||
CH | 10.02.1993 | ||
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
IT | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
LU | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
BE | 10.02.1993 | ||
CH | 10.02.1993 | ||
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
IT | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
BE | 10.02.1993 | ||
CH | 10.02.1993 | ||
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/23] | BE | 10.02.1993 | |
CH | 10.02.1993 | ||
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 10.02.1993 | |
CH | 10.02.1993 | ||
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | CH | 10.02.1993 | |
DE | 10.02.1993 | ||
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | CH | 10.02.1993 | |
LI | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 10.02.1993 | Cited in | International search | US2708543 [ ] (JOHN MATICH); | US3086612 [ ] (MCKINLEY DONALD E); | US3993275 [ ] (LUCAS EDWIN K); | US4230202 [ ] (KUDRA III ANTHONY J); | FR2542802 [ ] (REY HENRI [FR]); | WO8502650 [ ] (CLARKE JAMES BRIAN); | GB2156415 [ ] (KITSON MICHAEL JAMES); | GB2160570 [ ] (CRABBE HENRY JOHN FREDERICK) |