EP0396758 - DIRECT-ACTING ACTUATOR OF INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Nobutoshi Room 308, Fuyohaitsu 65-4, Takakura-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Susumu Room 7-204, Fanuc Manshonharimomi 3539-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | 03 /
HAMURA, Masayuki Room 8-103, Fanuc Manshonharimomi 3511-1, Shibokusa Oshina-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Akira Fanuc Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908520.3 | 24.07.1989 | [1990/46] | WO1989JP00740 | Priority number, date | JP19880198821 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19882188 | [1990/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001402 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396758 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396758 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/02, B25J18/02, B25J9/10 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
B25J9/102 (EP,US);
B25J9/02 (EP,KR,US);
B25J18/02 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32155 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18648 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20317 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/46] | B25J9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/46] | Title | German: | DIREKT WIRKENDER BETÄTIGER EINES INDUSTRIELLEN ROBOTERS | [1990/46] | English: | DIRECT-ACTING ACTUATOR OF INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | [1990/46] | French: | ACTUATEUR DE ROBOT INDUSTRIEL A ACTION DIRECTE | [1990/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1990 | Translation filed | 25.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.1990 | Search fee paid | 25.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2092747 ; | [A]FR2123238 (CUSANT JEANINE [FR]); | [A]FR2403873 (STAR KUGELHALTER GMBH DT [DE]); | [A]US4637771 (YASUKAWA KAZUYOSHI [JP]); | [A]EP0245530 (CINCINNATI MILACRON INC [US]) | International search | [Y]JP5214814Y ; | [Y]JPS61284379 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) |