EP0423229 - VEHICLE LOCK ASSEMBLY OPERABLE WITH TRANSMISSION SHIFTER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HURD LOCK AND MANUFACTURING CO., INC. P.O.Box 1450, 603 Bohannon Avenue Greenville, TN 37744-1450 / US | [1991/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANCHER, Ricky, L. Route 8, Box 244D Greeneville, TN 37743 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 89908608.6 | 03.07.1989 | [1991/17] | WO1989US02900 | Priority number, date | US19880216878 | 07.07.1988 Original published format: US 216878 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000660 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423229 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.01.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
B60R25/02144 (EP,US);
E05B85/00 (KR);
Y10T70/5938 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5956 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/17] | E05B65/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSCHLOSSZUSAMMENBAU, BETRIEBSFÄHIG DURCH EINEN GESCHWINDIGKEITSSCHALTER SOWIE VERFAHREN | [1991/17] | English: | VEHICLE LOCK ASSEMBLY OPERABLE WITH TRANSMISSION SHIFTER AND METHOD | [1991/17] | French: | SERRURE DE VEHICULE COMMANDEE PAR UN LEVIER DE VITESSES ET PROCEDE | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 14.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/05] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU470091 ; | [X]DE3616122 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]); | [X]DE8802327U | International search | [A]US3686906 (WATKINS JOHN, et al); | [A]US3703092 (ELLIOTT HAROLD V); | [A]US3887029 (LIPSCHUTZ PAUL, et al); | [A]US3949581 (TOYAMA SHIGEO, et al); | [A]US4052869 (WEBER GUNTER); | [A]US4249404 (KIMBERLIN DAN R [US]); | [A]US4270624 (JESSOP MICHAEL E); | [A]US4304112 (OSBORN CHARLES); | [A]US4474085 (DEVOGELAERE RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US4520640 (KRAMER RICHARD L [US]); | [A]GB2160485 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD); | [A]US4712397 (NISKANEN DON L [US]); | [X]US4724722 (BEAUCH HOWARD D [US], et al) |