Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE81805T | 15.11.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | EP89908686 | 01.08.1989 | DE8900502 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58902575D1 | 03.12.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | DE58902575 | 01.08.1989 | DE8900502 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK170462B | 11.09.1995 | B1 | DK21691D0 | 08.02.1991 | D0 | DK21691 | 08.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | DE8900502 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0632919B | 02.05.1994 | B2 | JPH03504696 | 17.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | DE8900502 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO174578C | 01.06.1994 | C | NO174578B | 21.02.1994 | B | NO910512L | 08.02.1991 | L | NO910512D0 | 08.02.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | DE8900502 | 01.08.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9001381 | Global Dossier | 22.02.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0432173 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1992 | B1 | EP0432173 | 19.06.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3827077 | 14.09.1989 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8817030U | 12.12.1991 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2014380 | 01.07.1990 | A6 | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5152209 | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3827077 | 10.08.1988 |