EP0429481 - NYLON-PEBA COPOLYMER CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallinckrodt, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 675 McDonnell Boulevard P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 675 McDonnell Boulevard P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis Missouri 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Yue-Teh 406 Pebbleshire Houston, TX 77062 / US | 02 /
LIEBMANN, Vern, L. 3443 Mimosa Way Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 03 /
VILLMAN, Glenda, S. Route 2 Box 313 Freeport, TX 77541 / US | 04 /
AMIN, Surendra, A. 4545 West Meadow Lane Lake Charles, LA 70605 / US | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908742.3 | 18.07.1989 | [1991/23] | WO1989US03067 | Priority number, date | US19880229991 | 09.08.1988 Original published format: US 229991 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001345 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429481 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429481 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/00, A61M25/00 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/049 (EP,US);
A61L29/145 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/049, C08L77/12 (EP,US);
A61L29/085, C08L75/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | KATHETER AUS NYLON-PEBA-COPOLYMER | [1991/23] | English: | NYLON-PEBA COPOLYMER CATHETER | [1991/23] | French: | CATHETER EN COPOLYMERE DE NYLON-AMIDE BLOC DE POLYETHER | [1991/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   15.01.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4563181 (WIJAYARATHNA BANDULA [US], et al); | [Y]US4100309 (MICKLUS MICHAEL J, et al); | [A]EP0093093 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]); | [A]EP0144629 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) |