EP0436551 - A BRACKET FOR TRANSPORTING A CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industri AB Thule Box 69 S-330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [1991/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGLANDER, Curt Transbärsstigen 1 S-330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 S-331 01 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 89908899.1 | 10.07.1989 | [1991/29] | WO1989SE00400 | Priority number, date | SE19880003224 | 13.09.1988 Original published format: SE 8803224 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002669 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436551 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436551 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/10 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
B60R9/048 (EP,US);
B60R9/10 (EP,US);
Y10S224/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/29] | Title | German: | STÜTZE ZUM TRANSPORT EINES FAHRRADES | [1991/29] | English: | A BRACKET FOR TRANSPORTING A CYCLE | [1991/29] | French: | SUPPORT POUR TRANSPORTER UN CYCLE | [1991/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.1994 | BE | 07.12.1994 | CH | 07.12.1994 | LI | 07.12.1994 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/42] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
BE | 07.12.1994 | ||
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 07.12.1994 | |
CH | 07.12.1994 | ||
LI | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 07.12.1994 | |
LI | 07.12.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2251461 (PREALPINA SAS [IT]); | [A]DE3137348 (ITEM INDUSTRIETECHNIK UND MASC [DE]); | [A]DE3104652 (TITTEL EBERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE3217319 (FIOL JAMES [FR]); | [X]US4629104 (JACQUET BERNARD A [FR]) |