Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] |
16.10.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] |
18.03.1992 | Change - French title | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
24.06.1991 | First examination report | |
15.09.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] |
15.09.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] |