blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0427765

EP0427765 - ALKOXY-4(1H)-PYRIDONE DERIVATIVES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARING THEM AND THEIR USE AS DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GÖDECKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Salzufer 16
D-10587 Berlin / DE
[1993/04]
Former [1991/21]For all designated states
GÖDEKKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Salzufer 16
D-1000 Berlin 10 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ARANDA, Julian
Sulzgasse 5
D-7801 Vörstetten / DE
02 / HARTENSTEIN, Johannes
Fohrenbühl 23
D-7801 Stegen-Wittental / DE
03 / RECK, Reinhard
Vogesenstr. 15
D-7831 Sexau / DE
04 / SCHÄCHTELE, Christoph
Darriwald 16
D-7800 Freiburg / DE
05 / RUDOLPH, Claus
Riedmattenstr. 11
D-7800 Freiburg / DE
06 / OSSWALD, Hartmut
Händelstrasse 10
D-7830 Emmendingen / DE
07 / WEINHEIMER, Günter
Sachsenstr. 4
D-7819 Denzlingen / DE
[1991/21]
Representative(s)Mansmann, Ivo, et al
Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9
79090 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]Mansmann, Ivo, et al
Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9
D-79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date89908987.404.08.1989
[1991/21]
WO1989EP00927
Priority number, dateDE1988382684606.08.1988         Original published format: DE 3826846
[1991/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9001477
Date:22.02.1990
Language:DE
[1990/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0427765
Date:22.05.1991
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1991/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0427765
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.1990
ClassificationIPC:C07D213/69, A61K31/44, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, A61K31/495
[1991/21]
CPC:
C07D401/06 (EP,US); C07D213/69 (EP,KR,US); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/04]
Former [1991/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:ALKOXY-4(1H)-PYRIDON-DERIVATIVE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL[1991/21]
English:ALKOXY-4(1H)-PYRIDONE DERIVATIVES, PROCESSES FOR PREPARING THEM AND THEIR USE AS DRUGS[1991/21]
French:DERIVES D'ALKOXY-4(1H)-PYRIDONE, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET LEUR EMPLOI COMME MEDICAMENTS[1991/21]
MiscellaneousEPB 1993/06: Verbunden mit 89114477.6/0354495 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 23.12.92
EPB 1993/06: Consolidated with 89114477.6/0354495 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 23.12.92
EPB 1993/06: Jointe à la demande no. 89114477.6/0354495 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 23.12.92
Entry into regional phase28.01.1991National basic fee paid 
04.08.1989Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1990Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
28.01.1991Examination requested  [1991/21]
26.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.04.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination17.06.1999Appeal received
17.06.1999Statement of grounds filed
12.07.1999Interlocutory revision of appeal
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 10
19.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US2965641  (PETER KRIMMEL CARL);
 [A]EP0120670  (NAT RES DEV [GB])
 [X]  - Bulletin of the Chemical Society of Japan, Band 52, Nr. 1, Januar 1979 (JP) K. IMAFUKU et al.: "Structure of 5-Hydroxy-2-Hydroxymethyl-4-Pyridones", Seiten 107-110, In der Anmeldung erwähnt
 [X]  - Journal of Heterocyclic Chemistry, Band 23, Nr. 5, Januar/Februar 1986 Heterocorporation siehe Verbindungen 2-8, In der Anmeldung erwähnt
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.