EP0426754 - ADJUSTABLE GIRTH SHOE CONSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEN, Henri E. 229 Coolidge Avenue Watertown, MA 02172 / US | [1991/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89909288.6 | 27.07.1989 | [1991/20] | WO1989US03241 | Priority number, date | US19880226402 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: US 226402 | US19880226403 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: US 226403 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001275 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426754 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426754 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/26 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
A43B3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | WEITENVERSTELLBARE SCHUHKONSTRUKTION | [1991/20] | English: | ADJUSTABLE GIRTH SHOE CONSTRUCTIONS | [1991/20] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS DE CHAUSSURES AVEC CIRCONFERENCE REGLABLE | [1991/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Request for further processing for: | 20.10.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1990 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.1995 | NL | 15.02.1995 | SE | 15.05.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1996/04] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
SE | 15.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 15.02.1995 | |
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 15.02.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR993360 ; | [A]US3404468 (ELLIOTT ROSEN HENRI); | [A]US3541708 (ROSEN HENRI ELLIOTT); | [A]US3686777 (ROSEN HENRI ELLIOTT) |