EP0382835 - MEANS AND METHOD FOR STERILIZING SPICES AND LIKE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWLY WEDS FOODS, INC 4140 West Fullerton Chicago, IL 60600 / US | [1990/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDEK, Daniel, H. 5 Fireoak Court Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US | 02 /
ANGELL, Donald, W. Route 1 Box 91 Gerald, MO 63037 / US | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/34] | Alexander, Thomas Bruce Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89909350.4 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/34] | WO1989US03224 | Priority number, date | US19880225249 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: US 225249 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000865 | Date: | 08.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382835 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382835 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23B9/02, A23B7/005, A23L3/18, A23L3/00 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
A23L3/001 (EP);
A23B7/0053 (EP);
A23B9/025 (EP);
A23L3/185 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/34] | A23L3/18, A61L2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/32] |
Former [1990/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STERILISIERUNG VON GEWÜRZEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1990/34] | English: | MEANS AND METHOD FOR STERILIZING SPICES AND LIKE SUBSTANCES | [1990/34] | French: | MOYEN ET PROCEDE DE STERILISATION D'EPICES ET SUBSTANCES ANALOGUES | [1990/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.1990 | Search fee paid | 28.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1996 | CH | 21.08.1996 | IT | 21.08.1996 | LI | 21.08.1996 | NL | 21.08.1996 | SE | 21.11.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
NL | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 21.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2551981 (THOMPSON ALBERT R); | [X]FR1439916 ; | [A]GB1168131 (KARLSRUHE AUGSBURG IWEKA [DE]); | [Y]EP0269257 (MCCORMICK & CO INC [US]) | International search | [A]US3994685 (LODIGE WILHELM, et al); | [A]FR2387607 (BRETAGNE ATEL CHANTIERS); | [A]US4421020 (GROSS DAVID R [US]); | [X]US4543263 (GOLDHAHN STEPHEN L [US]); | [X]US4547383 (GOLDHAHN STEPHEN L [US]); | [AP]US4844933 (HSIEH RON C [US], et al) |