EP0423241 - PROCESS FOR MAKING SUPERCONDUCTORS AND THEIR PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRULINER, Joe, Douglas 33 Bridleshire Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | 02 /
HOROWITZ, Harold, Saul 22 Stable Court Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 03 /
McLAIN, Stephan, James R.D.No. 2, Box 115 Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 04 /
SLEIGHT, Arthur, William Dept. of Chem. Oregon State University Corvallis, Oregon 97331-4003 / US | [1991/31] |
Former [1991/17] | 01 /
DRULINER, Joe, Douglas 33 Bridleshire Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
02 /
HOROWITZ, Harold, Saul 22 Stable Court Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | |||
03 /
McLAIN, Stephan, James R.D.No. 2, Box 115 Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | |||
04 /
SLEIGHT, Arthur, William 111 Taylor Lane Kennett Square, PA 19348 / US | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89909512.9 | 30.06.1989 | [1991/17] | WO1989US02801 | Priority number, date | US19880214702 | 01.07.1988 Original published format: US 214702 | US19890372726 | 28.06.1989 Original published format: US 372726 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000154 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423241 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423241 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01G3/00, C04B35/00 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G3/006 (EP,KR,US);
C07C215/08 (EP,US);
H10N60/0772 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/76 (EP,US);
C01P2002/86 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (EP,US);
C01P2006/34 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S505/737 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/17] | C01F17/00, C01B13/14, C01G3/02, C04B35/50, H01B1/08, B01J23/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUPRALEITERN UND DEREN VORLÄUFERN | [1991/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING SUPERCONDUCTORS AND THEIR PRECURSORS | [1991/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATIOON DE SUPRACONDUCTEURS ET LEURS PRECURSEURS | [1991/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/40: Teilanmeldung 94111548.7 eingereicht am 30/06/89 | EPB 1995/40: Divisional application 94111548.7 filed on 30/06/89 | EPB 1995/40: Demande divisionnaire 94111548.7 déposée le 30/06/89 | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94111548.7 / EP0628537 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.1995 | CH | 04.10.1995 | LI | 04.10.1995 | NL | 04.10.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/13] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 04.10.1995 |