EP0387326 - DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY FASTENING A MOULD FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUCHER-GUYER AG Maschinenfabrik CH-8166 Niederweningen / CH | [1990/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINMANN, Walter Eckhausstrasse 3 D-7897 Kadelburg / DE | 02 /
RAUDIES, Gerhard Rebsteinstrasse 400 CH-5704 Egliswil / CH | [1990/38] | Application number, filing date | 89909698.6 | 12.09.1989 | [1990/38] | WO1989CH00168 | Priority number, date | CH19880003419 | 14.09.1988 Original published format: CH 341988 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002651 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387326 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387326 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/02, B28B7/00 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B28B7/0014 (EP,US);
B30B15/026 (EP,US);
Y10S100/918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT [1990/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LÖSBAREN BEFESTIGUNG EINES FORMRAHMENS | [1990/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY FASTENING A MOULD FRAME | [1990/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA FIXATION AMOVIBLE D'UN CADRE DE MOULAGE | [1990/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3314272 (BUCHER GUYER AG MASCH [CH]); | [A]US4412800 (DORSEY ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US4373889 (BROWN LEONARD); | [A]DE2129690 (DORSTENER MASCHF AG) |