EP0431163 - COMPOSITE CIRCULATION FLUIDIZED BED BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ota-ku Tokyo, 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHSHITA, Takahiro 1502-36, Kitahassaku-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 226 / JP | 02 /
NAGATO, Shuichi 2-3-3208-844, Shiomidai 3-chome Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235 / JP | 03 /
MIYOSHI, Norihisa 2-3-3205-512, Shiomidai 3-chome Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235 / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/24] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr., Dipl.Phys. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89909857.8 | 30.08.1989 | [1991/24] | WO1989JP00883 | Priority number, date | JP19880215135 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21513588 | [1991/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002293 | Date: | 08.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431163 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431163 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23C11/02, F22B31/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
F23C10/02 (EP);
F23C10/00 (KR);
F22B31/0084 (EP);
F22B31/0092 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/24] | F23C11/02, F22B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | WIRBELBETTOFEN MIT VERBUNDUMLAUF | [1991/24] | English: | COMPOSITE CIRCULATION FLUIDIZED BED BOILER | [1991/24] | French: | CHAUDIERE A LIT FLUIDISE A CIRCULATION COMPOSITE | [1991/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1990 | Translation filed | 27.06.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.1990 | Search fee paid | 27.06.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.12.1995 | CH | 06.12.1995 | LI | 06.12.1995 | LU | 31.08.1996 | [2000/06] |
Former [1997/28] | BE | 06.12.1995 | |
CH | 06.12.1995 | ||
LI | 06.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1081739 (CONTAINER CORP); | [A]DE2449798 (RHEINSTAHL AG); | [A]GB2046886 (FOSTER WHEELER POWER PROD); | [Y]EP0124636 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]GB2151503 (JOHNSON WILLIAM BENEDICT); | [Y]EP0230309 (EBARA CORP [JP]) | [A] - D.L.KEAIRNS ET AL 'Evaluation of the fluidized-bed combustion process, Volume 1' December 1973 , ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY , WASHINGTON D.C. | International search | [Y]JPH06373091 ; | [Y]JPS57139205 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK); | [Y]JPS62141408 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS63143409 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) |