EP0434723 - FLOW CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.05.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRODEFORS, Lage Terrassgatan 15 S-411 33 Goteborg / SE | For all designated states IRSTAM, Lars Lilla Askimsvagen 6 S-436 00 Askim / SE | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Barnieske, Hans Wolfgang c/o H.W. Barnieske Patentbyra AB Turingegatan 26 P.O. Box 25 S-151 21 Södertälje 1 / SE | [1991/27] | Application number, filing date | 89910216.4 | 15.09.1989 | [1991/27] | WO1989SE00498 | Priority number, date | SE19880003272 | 16.09.1988 Original published format: SE 8803272 | [1991/27] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002988 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434723 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/00 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G05D7/0186 (EP);
G05D7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/27] | Title | German: | FLUSSREGELUNG | [1991/27] | English: | FLOW CONTROL | [1991/27] | French: | REGULATEUR DE DEBIT | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1990 | Translation filed | 13.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/29] | 04.03.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4393651 ; | [Y]FR1492508 ; | [A]US3792609 ; | [A]US3951377 ; | [A]DE3639161 ; | [A]DE896567 ; | [A]US3129582 ; | [A]US3079796 ; | [Y]US4422339 |