EP0419581 - METHOD FOR INTERCALATING ORGANIC-SWELLED LAYERED METAL CHALCOGENIDE WITH A POLYMERIC CHALCOGENIDE BY PLURAL TREATMENTS WITH POLYMERIC CHALCOGENIDE PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUFDEMBRINK, Brent Allen 10 Madelyn Avenue Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89910745.2 | 13.04.1989 | [1991/14] | WO1989US01571 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011827 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419581 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/06, B01J20/10 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
B01J29/049 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | METHODE UM EIN POLYMERES CHALKOGENID ZWISCHEN EIN ORGANISCH GEQUOLLENES GESCHICHTETES METALLCHALKOGENID ZU BRINGEN DURCH MEHRFACHE BEHANDLUNG MIT EINEM POLYMEREN CHALKOGENIDVORLÄUFER | [1991/14] | English: | METHOD FOR INTERCALATING ORGANIC-SWELLED LAYERED METAL CHALCOGENIDE WITH A POLYMERIC CHALCOGENIDE BY PLURAL TREATMENTS WITH POLYMERIC CHALCOGENIDE PRECURSOR | [1991/14] | French: | PROCEDE D'INTERCALATION DE CHALCOGENURE METALLIQUE EN COUCHES A GONFLEMENT ORGANIQUE, AVEC UN CHALCOGENURE POLYMERE, PAR DES TRAITEMENTS MULTIPLES A L'AIDE D'UN PRECURSEUR DE CHALCOGENURE POLYMERE | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 10.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 10.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/33] | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0205711 ; | [A]WO8800090 | International search | [E]US4831005 ; | [E]US4831006 |