EP0413823 - SPINDLE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takao Estate Hachioji 2-502 469-4, Kobikimachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 02 /
FUJIBAYASHI, Kentaro 2-8-6, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Morimasa 520-64-510, Nagabusamachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | [1991/09] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89910927.6 | 29.09.1989 | [1991/09] | WO1989JP01002 | Priority number, date | JP19880264874 | 20.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26487488 | [1991/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004816 | Date: | 03.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413823 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/18 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G05B19/4083 (EP,US);
G05B19/4144 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33128 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35392 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/09] | Title | German: | SPINDELSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [1991/09] | English: | SPINDLE CONTROL SYSTEM | [1991/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE BROCHE | [1991/09] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1990 | Translation filed | 12.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1990 | Search fee paid | 12.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/20] | 25.12.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60003006 ; | [Y]US3818301 (SINDELAR E); | [A]EP0091774 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 116 (P-357)(1839) 21 May 1985 & JP-A-60 003 006 ( KOGYO GIJUTSUIN ) 9 January 1985, & JP60003006 A 19850109 | International search | [X]JPH06354605 ; | [A]JPH01150909 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) |