EP0446353 - OPERATION AUTOMATING APPARATUS OF HYDRAULIC DRIVING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, K. Komatsu Electronics Man. Div. 2597 Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 Kanagawa 254 / JP | 02 /
KAMIDE, T. Komatsu Electronics Manufacturing Div. 2597 Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 03 /
NOTE, K. Komatsu Electronics Manufacturing Div. 2597 Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, K. Komatsu Electronics Man. Div. 2597 Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 254 54 / JP | 05 /
MAEDA, S. Komatsu Electronics Manufacturing Div. 2597 Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1991/38] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89910931.8 | 28.09.1989 | [1991/38] | WO1989JP00986 | Priority number, date | JP19890250045 | 26.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25004589 | [1991/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105113 | Date: | 18.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446353 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446353 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.04.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
E02F3/438 (EP,US);
E02F9/22 (KR);
E02F9/221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSAUTOMATISIERUNGSAPPARAT EINER HYDRAULISCH ANGETRIEBENEN MASCHINE | [1991/38] | English: | OPERATION AUTOMATING APPARATUS OF HYDRAULIC DRIVING MACHINE | [1991/38] | French: | INSTALLATION AUTOMATISANT LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE A ENTRAINEMENT HYDRAULIQUE | [1991/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1990 | Translation filed | 25.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1990 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.06.1996 | [1996/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62244931 ; | [X]FR2510278 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [E]EP0448716 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0406435 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 120 (M-685)26 October 1987 & JP-A-62 244 931 ( KOMATSU ), & JP62244931 A 19871026 | International search | JPS5824036 [ ] (MANNESMANN AG); | JPS61296406 [ ] (KOBE STEEL LTD); | JPS5968445 [ ] (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD); | JPS6033940 [ ] (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | JPS59220534 [ ] (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) | Examination | JPS5824036 | JPS5968445 | JPS6033940 |