EP0393179 - PROCESS FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY AND/OR DRYING AND PROCESS HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saarberg-Interplan, Gesellschaft für Rohstoff-, Energie- und Ingenieurtechnik mbH Malstatter Markt 13 66115 Saarbrücken / DE | For all designated states ORGREB-INSTITUT FÜR KRAFTWERKE 03226 Vetschau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states Saarberg-Interplan, Gesellschaft für Rohstoff-, Energie- und Ingenieurtechnik mbH Malstatter Markt 13 D-66115 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
For all designated states ORGREB-INSTITUT FÜR KRAFTWERKE D-03226 Vetschau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPLIETHOFF, Heinz Warken-Ecksteinstrasse 3 D-6605 Friedrichsthal / DE | 02 /
MÖLLER, Burkhard Feuerbachstrasse 20 DR-8020 Dresden / DD | 03 /
WOLF, Bodo Forstweg 9 DR-8210 Freital / DD | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 D-45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89911022.5 | 12.10.1989 | [1990/43] | WO1989DE00650 | Priority number, date | DE19883835428 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3835428 | DE19883835427 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3835427 | [1990/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004702 | Date: | 03.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393179 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393179 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01K17/06, F26B23/00, F26B3/084 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
F23K1/04 (EP,US);
F01K17/06 (EP,US);
F26B23/001 (EP,US);
F26B23/028 (EP,US);
F26B3/084 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE UND/ODER HEIZ- UND PROZESSWÄRME | [1990/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY AND/OR DRYING AND PROCESS HEAT | [1990/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DE L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE ET/OU DE LA CHALEUR DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE LA CHALEUR INDUSTRIELLE | [1990/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.10.1992 | LI | 31.10.1992 | [1993/38] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1072953 ; | [A]DE1053526 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]AT345769B (WAAGNER BIRO AG [AT]); | [A]DE2923614 (STAL LAVAL TURBIN AB); | [A]GB2052708 (ESCHER WYSS LTD); | [A]DE2929486 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]US4615122 (SHERROD EARLE H [US], et al); | [A]US4627173 (O'HAGAN MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [AP]WO8810359 (KORPELA TIMO [FI]); | [AP]EP0307744 (WAAGNER BIRO AG [AT]); | [AP]DE3731720 (SAARBERG INTERPLAN GMBH [DE], et al) | Examination | AT345679B |