EP0434751 - A MALARIA ANTIGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STATENS SERUMINSTITUT Amager Boulevard 80 DK-2300 Copenhagen / DK | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DZIEGIEL, Morten Ostervang 28 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | 02 /
BORRE, Martin Griffenfeldsgade 37 C, st.tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 03 /
JEPSEN, Soren Luxembourglaan 33 B-1900 Overisse / BE | 04 /
VUUST, Jens Sovej 138 A DK-2791 Dragor / DK | 05 /
RIENECK, Klaus Marthagade 10, 2.th. DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | 06 /
WIND, Anette Kjarbovange 18 DK-3520 Farum / DK | 07 /
JAKOBSEN, Palle, Hoy Torndalsvej 14 DK-4600 Koge / DK | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Plougmann, Ole Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Plougmann, Ole c/o Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 89911024.1 | 18.09.1989 | [1991/27] | WO1989DK00218 | Priority number, date | DK19880005191 | 16.09.1988 Original published format: DK 519188 | US19890318885 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: US 318885 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002811 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434751 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C12N15/30, A61K39/015, C07K13/00, G01N33/569 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/205 (EP);
C07K14/445 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | MALARIA-ANTIGEN | [1991/27] | English: | A MALARIA ANTIGEN | [1991/27] | French: | ANTIGENE DE MALARIA | [1991/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 12.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 23.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/12] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/12] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8402471 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | [A]EP0223665 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]); | [A]US4767622 (RISTIC MIODRAG [US], et al) |