EP0434753 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PRESTRESSED CONCRETE BEAM OR PLATE ELEMENT AND REINFORCING ASSEMBLIES FOR USE IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPAENCOM A/S Hedesvinget 4 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK | [1996/35] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states A/S DANSK SPAENDBETON Teglvaerksvej 1 DK-2640 Hedehusene / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIND, Erik Kettebakken 16 DK-2942 Skodsborg / DK | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Jessen, Ivar Bergishagen, et al c/o Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Jessen, Ivar Bergishagen, et al c/o Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 DK-2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 89911027.4 | 18.09.1989 | [1991/27] | WO1989DK00217 | Priority number, date | DK19880005205 | 19.09.1988 Original published format: DK 520588 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9003479 | Date: | 05.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434753 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434753 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/06, E04C3/26 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
E04C3/44 (EP);
E04C3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESPANNTEN BETONTRÄGERN BZW. -PLATTENELEMENTEN UND VERSTÄRKUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [1991/27] | English: | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PRESTRESSED CONCRETE BEAM OR PLATE ELEMENT AND REINFORCING ASSEMBLIES FOR USE IN THE METHOD | [1991/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE POUTRE OU D'UNE PLAQUE EN BETON PRECONTRAINT ET UNITES DE RENFORCEMENT A UTILISER DANS LEDIT PROCEDE | [1991/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.1997 | BE | 03.12.1997 | CH | 03.12.1997 | FR | 03.12.1997 | IT | 03.12.1997 | LI | 03.12.1997 | NL | 03.12.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
FR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
DE | 04.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
DE | 04.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
DE | 04.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
DE | 04.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DE | 04.03.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1457999 (JULIUS PEDERSEN WALDEMAR); | [A]US2874812 (CLEVETT JR MERTON L); | [A]US2877506 (ALMOSLINO HANS A); | [A]US4144687 (BRUNES TONS J); | [A]DE3129347 ; | [A]GB2197356 (DOW MAC CONCRETE LTD); | [A]DK152999B (DANSK SPAEND AS [DK]) |