EP0428627 - REVERSE BULGED FORWARD ACTING SCORED RUPTURE DISC BULKHEAD STRUCTURE FOR MULTI-STAGE ROCKET MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fike Corporation 704 South 10th Street Blue Springs Missouri 64015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states Fike Corporation 704 South 10th Street Blue Springs Missouri 64015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBLER, Donald, R., Sr. Rt. 1, Box 35E Bates City, MO 64011 / US | 02 /
HINRICHS, James, O. R.R 3, Box 168K Odessa, MO 64076 / US | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89911134.8 | 10.08.1989 | [1991/22] | WO1989US03425 | Priority number, date | US19880231204 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: US 231204 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001634 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428627 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428627 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/28 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
F02K9/978 (EP,US);
F02K9/28 (EP,US);
F02K9/38 (EP,US);
F02K9/763 (EP,US);
F42B15/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG GEGEN DIE ÜBERHITZUNG VON RAKETENMOTOREN MECHANISCHER AUSLÖSUNG | [1991/22] | English: | REVERSE BULGED FORWARD ACTING SCORED RUPTURE DISC BULKHEAD STRUCTURE FOR MULTI-STAGE ROCKET MOTOR | [1991/22] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CLOISON ETANCHE AVEC DISQUE DE RUPTURE ENTAILLE A CONVEXITE INVERSEE AGISSANT VERS L'AVANT POUR MOTEURS DE FUSEES A ETAGES MULTIPLES | [1991/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 12.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [A]US3564845 (FRIEDMAN ISIDORE H JR, et al); | [A]US3879942 (DORN WOLFGANG, et al); | [A]US4104878 (CHASE MICHAEL JOHN); | [X]US4505180 (HINRICHS JAMES O [US]); | [A]US4738099 (HIBLER SR DONALD R [US], et al); | [AP]US4766726 (TACKETT E WAYNE [US], et al); | [AP]US4829765 (BOLIEAU CHRISTOPHER W [US], et al); | [AP]US4841724 (HALL JOHN M [GB], et al) |