EP0394480 - STRUCTURE OF SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE TRANSDUCER HAVING SMALL ELECTRODE GAPS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI, Kazuhiko 13, Matsugaoka 37-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 982 / JP | [1990/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89911403.7 | 12.10.1989 | [1990/44] | WO1989JP01046 | Priority number, date | JP19880260210 | 16.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26021088 | [1990/48] |
Former [1990/44] | JP19880260210 | 16.10.1988 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004285 | Date: | 19.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394480 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394480 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/145, H03H3/08 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
H03H3/08 (EP);
H03H9/02818 (EP);
H03H9/14505 (EP);
H03H9/14541 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/44] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR EINES UMFORMERS VON OBERFLÄCHENWELLEN, MIT KLEINEN ELEKTRODENLÜCKEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1990/44] | English: | STRUCTURE OF SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE TRANSDUCER HAVING SMALL ELECTRODE GAPS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [1990/44] | French: | STRUCTURE D'UN TRANSDUCTEUR D'ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE SURFACE PRESENTANT DE PETITS INTERSTICES ENTRE LES ELECTRODES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE TRANSDUCTEUR | [1990/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1990 | Translation filed | 09.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1990 | Search fee paid | 09.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61234114 ; | [X]JP57162819 ; | [Y]JP61006917 ; | [A]JP60149214 ; | [X]US4450374 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 81 (E-488)[2528], 12th March 1987; & JP-A-61 234 114 (TOYO COMMUN. EQUIP. CO., LTD) 18-10-1986, & JP61234114 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 4 (E-151)[1149], 8th January 1983; & JP-A-57 162 819 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 06-10-1982, & JP57162819 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 145 (E-407), 28th May 1986; & JP-A-61 006 917 (KAZUHIKO YAMANOUCHI) 13-01-1986, & JP61006917 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 315 (E-365)[2038], 11th december 1985; & JP-A-60 149 214 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.), & JP60149214 A 00000000 | [A] - I.E.E.E. TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS, AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, vol. UFFC-34, no. 5, September 1987, pages 531-539, IEEE, New York, US; K. YAMANOUCHI et al.: "New-low-loss surface acoustic wave transducers in the UHF range" | International search | [Y]JPS61274415 ; | [Y]JPH05258383 |