EP0561770 - DIAMOND SAWING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENANAYAKE, Daya Ranjit 9, Ecrin Place Colombo 8 / LK | [1993/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Gee, David William Farmhouse Court Marston Nr. Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B76 0DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Gee, David William Farmhouse Court Marston Nr. Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B76 0DW / GB | Application number, filing date | 89912013.3 | 14.11.1989 | [1993/39] | WO1989LK00002 | Priority number, date | LK19540000099 | 16.11.1988 Original published format: LK 9954 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005624 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561770 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B28D5/00, B24B9/16 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
A44C17/001 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B28D1/221 (EP,US);
B28D5/00 (EP,US);
B28D5/0005 (EP,US);
B23K2103/30 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/39] | Title | German: | DIAMANTSÄGEVERFAHREN | [1993/39] | English: | DIAMOND SAWING PROCESS | [1993/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE TAILLAGE DE DIAMANTS | [1993/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 16.05.1991 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/36] | 24.04.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US671830 (LOESSER ERNEST [US]); | [A]US671831 (LOESSER ERNEST [US]); | [A]US694215 (STUURMAN JOHN H G [US]); | [A]US732118 (SCHENCK ERNEST G H [US]); | [A]US732119 (SCHENCK ERNEST G H [US]); | [A]GB122470 (GROESSER JULES [GB], et al) |