EP0429549 - STARCH-BASED PRODUCTS FOR MICROWAVE COOKING OR HEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PILLSBURY COMPANY 200 South Sixth Street Minneapolis, MN 55402-1464 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states THE PILLSBURY COMPANY 200 South 6th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Victor, T. 7309 Parkview Drive Moundsview, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
HOSENEY, R., Carl 852 Church Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | 03 /
GRAF, Ernst 1337 16th Avenue, NW New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | 04 /
GHIASI, Katy 3516 Chelmsford Road St. Anthony, MN 55418 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Linda, C. 2821 Webster Avenue, South St. Louis Park, MN 55416 / US | 06 /
WEBER, Jean, L. 2529 Brighton Avenue, NE St. Anthony, MN 55418 / US | 07 /
GAERTNER, Karin, C. 9524 Pierce Street, NE Blaine, MN 55434 / US | 08 /
MATSON, Kristin, L. 1455 106th Avenue, NW Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | 09 /
HUNSTIGER, Antoinette, M. 4809 Roycar Road Edina, MN 55435 / US | 10 /
ROGERS, Deborah, E. Route 5 Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | 11 /
SAGUY, Israel, A. 7250 York Avenue, South Edina, MN 55435 / US | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89912077.8 | 29.06.1989 | [1991/23] | WO1989US02897 | Priority number, date | US19880213075 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: US 213075 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9000010 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429549 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/06, A21D2/02, A21D2/14, A21D2/24, A21D2/28, A21D2/16 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
A21D2/02 (EP);
A21D2/145 (EP);
A21D2/16 (EP);
A21D2/24 (EP);
A21D2/28 (EP);
A21D8/042 (EP);
A21D8/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/23] | Title | German: | AUF STÄRKE BASIERTE ERZEUGNISSE FÜR MIKROWELLENKOCHEN UND -ERHITZEN | [1991/23] | English: | STARCH-BASED PRODUCTS FOR MICROWAVE COOKING OR HEATING | [1991/23] | French: | PRODUITS A BASE D'AMIDON DESTINES A UNE CUISSON ET UN CHAUFFAGE PAR MICRO-ONDES | [1991/23] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/19: Teilanmeldung 94102720.3 eingereicht am 29/06/89 | EPB 1994/19: Divisional application 94102720.3 filed on 29/06/89 | EPB 1994/19: Demande divisionnaire 94102720.3 déposée le 29/06/89 | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP94102720.3 / EP0617896 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR380769 [ ]; | DE2246214 [ ]; | US3694228 [ ]; | US3556798 [ ]; | DE1442042 [ ] |