EP0397831 - TREATMENT OF OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boots Company PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states The Boots Company PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states THE BOOTS COMPANY PLC 1 Thane Road West Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEINBAUM, Monte, Lee 66 Colony Bend Shreveport, LA 71115 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Thacker, Michael Anthony, et al THE BOOTS COMPANY PLC Group Patents Department 10th Floor, Newland House 49 Mount Street Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB | [1990/47] | Application number, filing date | 89912801.1 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/47] | WO1989GB01383 | Priority number, date | US19880277240 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: US 277240 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006110 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397831 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397831 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON OBESITAS | [1990/47] | English: | TREATMENT OF OBESITY | [1990/47] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'OBESITE | [1990/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.09.1993 | [2002/24] | Cited in | International search | WO8806444 [ ] (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) | [ ] - Lehrbuch der Pharmakologie und Toxikologie, ed. by Hermann Bader, Ed. Medizin Weinheim (DE) page 101 | [ ] - Martindale The Extra Pharmacopoeia, 28th Edition, ed. by James E.F. Reynolds The Pharmaceutical Press, 1982 London (GB) page 65 | Examination | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry, 4th ed., Part III, 1981, p. 226-228 | - Goodman and Gilman's: The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, 8th ed., 1990, chapter 10, p. 187-192 |