Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] |
29.07.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |
03.07.1991 | First examination report | |
24.01.1991 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] |
06.10.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] |
06.10.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] |