Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE94385T | 15.10.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | EP89912801 | 21.11.1989 | GB8901383 | 21.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK175587B | 13.12.2004 | B1 | DK177690 | 13.09.1990 | A | DK177690D0 | 26.07.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | GB8901383 | 21.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1006002 | 05.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | GB8901383 | 21.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06102622B | 14.12.1994 | B2 | JPH02503682 | 01.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | GB8901383 | 21.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0164435B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR900701261 | 01.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | GB8901383 | 21.11.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5436272 | 25.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | US57610090 | 31.08.1990 | US96217592 | 15.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9006110 | Global Dossier | 14.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU633529B | Global Dossier | 04.02.1993 | B2 | AU4620789 | 26.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0397831 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1993 | B1 | EP0397831 | 22.11.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2003524 | 19.10.1999 | C | CA2003524 | 29.05.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19975039I | 30.03.2000 | I2 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68909219T | 13.01.1994 | T2 | DE68909219D1 | 21.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE61928 | 30.11.1994 | B1 | IE893690L | 29.05.1990 | L | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL92406 | 31.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU90866I | 18.02.2002 | I2 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL300066I | 03.06.2002 | I2 | NL300066I | 01.12.2001 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH26677 | 15.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA899058 | 29.08.1990 | B | Priority number | Date | US27724088 | 29.11.1988 |