Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | CH | | DE | | ES | Lapse: 15.09.1993 | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | | LU | | NL | | SE | | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1990 | National basic fee paid | | 02.07.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 02.07.1990 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 15.09.1993 | Opposition procedure | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 15.06.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 94385 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | | Event date: | 15.03.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT EEIH 94385 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE PERSON OF PATENT OWNER | | Event date: | 13.10.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE 8364 68909219 DE A | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION DURING TERM OF OPPOSITION | | Event date: | 12.11.1993 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 21.01.1994 | | Event description: | LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Event date: | 07.09.1994 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Event date: | 22.11.1990 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 15.09.1993 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 22.11.1990 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19900702 | | Event date: | 21.08.1991 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19910705 | | Event date: | 15.09.1993 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 94385 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19931015 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 21.10.1993 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 68909219 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19931021 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 11.11.1993 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVE | | Event date: | 31.12.1996 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | SCHMAUDER & WANN PATENTANWALTSBUERO, INHABER KLAUS | | Event date: | 31.12.1996 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | THE BOOTS COMPANY PLC TRANSFER- KNOLL AG | | Event date: | 22.01.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 30.04.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 31.01.1995 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 89912801.1 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Event date: | 03.03.1997 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | KNOLL AG | | Event date: | 31.07.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE 8327 68909219 DE A | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE PERSON/NAME/ADDRESS OF THE PATENT OWNER | OWNER: | KNOLL AG, 67061 LUDWIGSHAFEN, DE | | Event date: | 06.11.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFG | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB01/053 200210 | Filing DATE: | 20021010 | Expiry DATE: | 20140112 | | Event date: | 27.03.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | ABBOTT GMBH & CO. KG | Free Format Text: | KNOLL AG#KNOLLSTRASSE 32#D-67061 LUDWIGSHAFEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ABBOTT GMBH & CO. KG#MAX-PLANCK-RING 2#65205 WIESBADEN (DE) | | Event date: | 01.05.2003 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | ABBOTT GMBH | | Event date: | 01.05.2003 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | KNOLL GMBH | | Event date: | 01.05.2003 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1 | OWNER: | ABBOTT GMBH & CO. KG | | Event date: | 15.05.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT ESZA | Code Expl.: | +APPLICATION FILED FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SZ 34/2001 | Filing DATE: | 20011023 | | Event date: | 15.11.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT EEZF | Code Expl.: | +GRANT FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES) | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SZ 34/2001 | Filing DATE: | 20011023 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | Effective DATE: | 20020923 | | Event date: | 30.06.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | CHSPCFOICM-NO 54770/19990113, 19990528 | | Event date: | 31.05.2000 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | OICM-NO 54770/13.01.1999, 28.05.1999, EXPIRES: 13.01.2014 | | Event date: | 22.10.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | 0190039-8, 20010404 | | Event date: | 03.12.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL AC1 | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | NLAC1 300066, 20011004 | | Event date: | 19.12.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | GBCTFFSPC/GB2001/053: 20011109 | | Event date: | 18.02.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LU CCP | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | LUCCP 90866, EXPIRES: 20140114 | | Event date: | 03.06.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL KC1 | Code Expl.: | GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | NLKC1 300066, 20091121, EXPIRES: 20140113 | | Event date: | 01.05.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL TC | Code Expl.: | NOTIFICATION THAT NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATES WERE MODIFIED | | Event date: | 28.02.2003 | | Event description: | BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER | OWNER: | *ABBOTT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. | Effective DATE: | 20030225 | | Event date: | 28.02.2003 | | Event description: | BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME | OWNER: | *ABBOTT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. | Effective DATE: | 20030225 | | Event date: | 07.08.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE 8327 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE PERSON/NAME/ADDRESS OF THE PATENT OWNER | OWNER: | ABBOTT GMBH & CO. KG, 65205 WIESBADEN, DE | | Event date: | 09.09.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | 0190039-8, 20010404 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 0190039-8 | Filing DATE: | 20010404 | | Event date: | 09.09.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | 0190039-8 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 0190039-8 | | Event date: | 04.11.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | 01C0052, 20011210 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 01C0052 | Filing DATE: | 20011210 | | Event date: | 02.12.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | | Event date: | 15.03.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT EEIH 94385 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE PERSON OF PATENT OWNER | | Event date: | 24.03.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 24.03.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CJ | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM | | Event date: | 15.05.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE V448 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | +APPLICATION OF SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00, 19990114 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 199 75 039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | | Event date: | 27.11.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE V457 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | +SPC GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00, 19990114 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 199 75 039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | | Event date: | 24.08.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CY | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION GRANTED (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992) | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: CHLORHYDRATE DE SIBUTRAMINE MONOHYDRATE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: NL 23289 DU 20010613; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: IKS 54770 DU 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 01C0052 | Filing DATE: | 20011210 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 26.10.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR AV | Code Expl.: | OTHER ACTION AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT | | Event date: | 15.09.1993 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19930915 | | Event date: | 26.10.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR AV | Code Expl.: | OTHER ACTION AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2001C0052 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20081028 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20081021 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.01.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20081015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 27.02.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20081008 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.03.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20081118 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.03.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20081107 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.03.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20081128 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20081106 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.05.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20081128 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.06.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20081008 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.11.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 14.08.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCN | Code Expl.: | CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION NEW REPRESENTATIVE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C00397831/01 | REPRESENTATIVE: | SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELT | | Event date: | 16.12.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20091120 | | Event date: | 16.12.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFE | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE ENTERED INTO FORCE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRATE; REGISTERED: DE 41531.00.00 19990114; DE 41531.01.00 19990114; DE 41533.00.00 19990114; DE 41533.01.00 19990114; CH IKS 54770 19990113; UK PL 0169/0129 20010511; UK PL 0169/0130 20010511 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB01/053 | Filing DATE: | 20011109 | Expiry DATE: | 20091121 | Extension DATE: | 20140112 | | Event date: | 01.02.2010 | | Event description: | NL: CEASED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20091121 | | Event date: | 15.02.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT EELA 94385 AT T | Code Expl.: | -CANCELLED DUE TO LAPSE OF TIME | | Event date: | 26.02.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20091121 | | Event date: | 30.04.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20091120 | | Event date: | 30.11.2009 | | Event description: | BE: PATENT EXPIRED | OWNER: | *ABBOTT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G. | Effective DATE: | 20091121 | | Event date: | 31.12.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE CCCH 397831 BE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP OF THE SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | OWNER: | *ABBOT G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G. | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: KNOLL A.G.; PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRATE (EQUIVALENT TO SIBUTRAMINE FREE BASE) | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2001C/041 | Filing DATE: | 20011023 | Effective DATE: | 20051205 | | Event date: | 01.06.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCL | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C00397831/01 | | Event date: | 05.02.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB SPCE | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE EXPIRED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRATE; REGISTERED: DE 41531.00.00 19990114; DE 41531.01.00 19990114; DE 41533.00.00 19990114; DE 41533.01.00 19990114; CH IKS 54770 19990113; UK PL 0169/0129 20010511; UK PL 0169/0130 20010511 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB01/053 | Filing DATE: | 20011109 | Expiry DATE: | 20091121 | Extension DATE: | 20140112 | | Event date: | 22.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL SPCX | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE EXPIRED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE, IN HET BIJZONDER SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRAAT; NATL. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: RVG 26281 RVG 26282 20010404; FIRST REGISTRATION: DE 41531.00.00 41531.01.00 41533.01.00 19990114; CH IKS 54770 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 300066 | Filing DATE: | 20011004 | Expiry DATE: | 20091121 | Extension DATE: | 20140112 | | Event date: | 15.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT SPCX 94385 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF AN SPC | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 1-24052, 1-24053 20010423; FIRST REGISTRATION: LI 54770 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 34/2001 | Filing DATE: | 20011023 | Expiry DATE: | 20091121 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | Effective DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE CCRE 397831 BE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | OWNER: | *ABBOT G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G. | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRATE (EQUIVALENT TO SIBUTRAMINE FREE BASE); NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 479 IS 53 F 5 20010425; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 54770 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2001C/041 | Filing DATE: | 20040203 | Expiry DATE: | 20091121 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | Effective DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 01.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 13.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R409 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 28.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R409 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 14.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 07.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R409 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 04.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | Effective DATE: | 20120601 | | Event date: | 04.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | Effective DATE: | 20140114 | | Event date: | 10.12.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE MONOHYDRATE; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: NL 23 289 20010613; FIRST REGISTRATION: LI - IKS54770 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 01C0052 | Filing DATE: | 20011210 | | Event date: | 01.06.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R409 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 23.07.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R409 68909219 DE | Code Expl.: | INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SIBUTRAMINHYDROCHLORID-MONOHYDRAT; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 41531.00.00 19990114 FIRST REGISTRATION: SCHWEIZ / LIECHTENSTEIN 5477001 5477002 19990113 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 19975039 | Filing DATE: | 19990515 | Expiry DATE: | 20091122 | Extension DATE: | 20140113 | | Event date: | 29.07.1993 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 06.10.1990 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 16.07.1994 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 16.07.1994 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |