EP0445158 - PREPARATIONS OF OXYPURINOL AND/OR ITS ALKALI OR ALKALINE EARTH SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henning Berlin GmbH Chemie- und Pharmawerk Komturstrasse 58-62 D-12099 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states HENNING BERLIN GmbH CHEMIE- UND PHARMAWERK Komturstrasse 58-62 D-12099 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHR, Wolfgang Laubacher Strasse 1 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | 02 /
WEICKGENANNT, Guido Beerenstrasse 33 D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/37] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89912952.2 | 24.11.1989 | [1991/37] | WO1989EP01425 | Priority number, date | DE19883839825 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839825 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9006115 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445158 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445158 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K9/18, A61K47/32, A61K47/34 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/32 (EP);
A61K9/146 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN DES OXIPURINOLS UND/ODER SEINER ALKALI- ODER ERDALKALISALZE | [1991/37] | English: | PREPARATIONS OF OXYPURINOL AND/OR ITS ALKALI OR ALKALINE EARTH SALTS | [1991/37] | French: | PREPARATIONS D'OXYPURINOL ET/OU DE SES SELS ALCALINS OU ALCALINO-TERREUX | [1991/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB975850 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND); | DE2546371 [ ] (SANDOZ AG) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, Nr. 2, 14. Juli 1975, (Columbus, Ohio, US), J.H. COLLETT et al.: "Effects of Polyvinylpyrrolidone on the Solubility and Dissolution Rate of Allopurinol", siehe seite 340 *Zusammenfassung 15544t, & J. Pharm. Pharmacol. 1974, 26, Suppl., 84P-85P* | [ ] - Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, Band 60, Nr. 9, September 1971, WIN LOUNG CHIOU et al.: "Pharmaceutical Applications of Solid Dispersion Systems", pages 1281-1302 |