EP0446243 - ANCHORING MEANS FOR PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westman, Stig Räfsvägen 22 744 31 Heby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states Westman, Stig Räfsvägen 22 S-740 40 Heby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 89912993.6 | 29.11.1989 | [1991/38] | WO1989SE00695 | Priority number, date | SE19880004345 | 30.11.1988 Original published format: SE 8804345 | [1991/38] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006468 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446243 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446243 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/08, F16L37/12 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
F16L37/088 (EP,US);
Y10S285/917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/38] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ROHRE | [1991/38] | English: | ANCHORING MEANS FOR PIPES | [1991/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON POUR CANALISATIONS | [1991/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1990 | Translation filed | 18.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Request for further processing for: | 18.08.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1993 | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.07.1995 | LI | 05.07.1995 | [1996/18] | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE8601537 ; | [Y]US3389923 (LOVE JR WILLIAM D, et al); | [Y]SE331008 (METALLVERKEN ESSEM PLAST AB [SE]); | [A]DE3221009 (DRIL QUIP INC [US]); | [Y]GB2156467 (VETCO OFFSHORE IND INC); | [Y]SE452358 (SIAB [SE]) |