EP0445164 - INSTALLATION FOR A STEERABLE RIGID AXLE ON A TRACTOR CHASSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1994 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haupt, Josef Alpenblickstr. 48 D-7992 Tettnang / DE | [1992/29] |
Former [1991/37] | 01 /
HAUPT, Josef Motharistra e 5 D-7991 Oberteuringen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89913000.9 | 15.11.1989 | [1991/37] | WO1989EP01368 | Priority number, date | DE19883839821 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839821 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006242 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445164 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445164 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/22, B60G9/02 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
B60K17/22 (EP,US);
B60G9/02 (EP,US);
B60G2200/30 (EP,US);
B60G2200/324 (EP,US);
B60G2300/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG EINER LENKBAREN STARRACHSE AN EINEM FAHRGESTELL EINES ACKERSCHLEPPERS | [1991/37] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR A STEERABLE RIGID AXLE ON A TRACTOR CHASSIS | [1991/37] | French: | ESSIEU RIGIDE ORIENTABLE POUR LE CHASSIS D'UN TRACTEUR AGRICOLE | [1991/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.1993
22.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Patentwesen PR-P D-51057 Köln / DE | [1993/22] | 21.05.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.09.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 31.03.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.04.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE907254 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]FR803574 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]FR2596709 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]); | [AP]DE3834693 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) | [A] - "Technisches Konzept Mercedes-Benz Allradschlepper MK 6703.3561.00-00/0287" 28 Februar 1987, Daimler-Benz AG, Stuttgart-Untertürkheim siehe Seite 7 (in der Anmeldung erwähnt) |