EP0452335 - A PROCESSING MACHINE FOR BOILED/COOKED CRAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORESUND, Jan Roar Osthus N-4276 Vedavagen / NO | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89913123.9 | 16.11.1989 | [1991/43] | WO1989NO00120 | Priority number, date | NO19880005125 | 17.11.1988 Original published format: NO 885125 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005457 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452335 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452335 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A22C29/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
A22C29/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG GEKOCHTER KRABBEN | [1993/30] | English: | A PROCESSING MACHINE FOR BOILED/COOKED CRAB | [1991/43] | French: | MACHINE DE PREPARATION POUR CRABES BOUILLIS/CUITS | [1991/43] |
Former [1991/43] | Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung gekochtes/gebratenes Krabbe | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 16.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1993 | BE | 04.08.1993 | CH | 04.08.1993 | DE | 04.08.1993 | IT | 04.08.1993 | LI | 04.08.1993 | NL | 04.08.1993 | LU | 30.11.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
BE | 04.08.1993 | ||
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
DE | 04.08.1993 | ||
IT | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
NL | 04.08.1993 | ||
LU | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
BE | 04.08.1993 | ||
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
DE | 04.08.1993 | ||
IT | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
NL | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
BE | 04.08.1993 | ||
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
DE | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
NL | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
DE | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
CH | 04.08.1993 | ||
LI | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 04.08.1993 | |
LI | 04.08.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1565342 (UMRATH KARL D); | [A]FR1380964 (BUCKAU WOLF MASCHF R); | [A]US3229325 (AMELANG ERNST J); | [A]FR2192771 (KONSORTIUM ENTWICKLUNG KRABBEN [DE]) |