EP0406436 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING 5'-INOSINIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIO, Tatsuro 6-29-1, Sagamidai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Akihiro 4-17-9, Morino Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89913133.8 | 22.11.1989 | [1991/02] | WO1989JP01187 | Priority number, date | JP19880295687 | 22.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29568788 | [1991/16] |
Former [1991/02] | deleted | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005784 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406436 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/32, C12N15/54, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, // C12R1:19, C12R1:425, C12R1:13 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C12P19/32 (EP,KR);
C12N9/1077 (EP);
C12P39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/16] |
Former [1991/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5'-INOSINSÄURE | [1991/02] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING 5'-INOSINIC ACID | [1991/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDE 5'-INOSINIQUE | [1991/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1990 | Translation filed | 22.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1990 | Search fee paid | 22.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 23.10.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.1991 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP4839477B ; | [Y]JP4424309B ; | [Y]JP4116560B ; | [Y]JP4511556B |