Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910700534 | 15.03.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 | DE8900758 | 07.12.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9007188 | Global Dossier | 28.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0449852 | Global Dossier | 01.09.1993 | B1 | EP0449852 | 09.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3843138 | 19.08.1993 | C2 | DE3843138 | 28.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58905490D1 | 07.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5245501 | 14.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3843138 | 22.12.1988 |