Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] |
31.03.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] |
09.07.1992 | First examination report | |
11.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
13.11.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] |
07.07.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] |