EP0383008 - Molding method, particularly for plastics containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILCA S.p.A. Via Macello 18 I-26100 Cremona / IT | [1990/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balzarini, Vittorio Via Genala 71 Cremona / IT | 02 /
Gaboardi, Mario Via Dante 7 Pozzaglio (CR) / IT | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90100258.4 | 08.01.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | IT19890019446 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: IT 1944689 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383008 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383008 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383008 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/02, B65D1/38 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B29C53/06 (EP);
B42F7/145 (EP);
B29C37/0057 (EP);
B29L2031/712 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Formverfahren, insbesondere für Kunststoffbehälter | [1990/34] | English: | Molding method, particularly for plastics containers | [1990/34] | French: | Procédé de moulage, notamment pour des conteneurs en plastique | [1990/34] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1604569 (ICI LTD); | [A]US3688384 (MIZUSHIMA KYOHEI, et al); | [X]US4162781 (MORCOM PAUL J [US]); | [A]US4625879 (LIU CLARK W [US]) |