EP0379061 - Exterior cover part for a watch, and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | [1992/51] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loth, Eric Rue du Stand 105 CH-2502 Bienne / CH | 02 /
Walder, Pierre-Alain Rue du Milieu 11 CH-2502 Bienne / CH | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 90100499.4 | 11.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | CH19890000147 | 18.01.1989 Original published format: CH 14789 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379061 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379061 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/22, G04B43/00, C22C38/22 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C22C38/22 (EP);
G04B37/22 (EP);
G04B43/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/30] | Title | German: | Ausstattungsteil für eine Uhr und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/30] | English: | Exterior cover part for a watch, and method for manufacturing the same | [1990/30] | French: | Pièce extérieure d'habillement pour montre et procédé pour la fabrication d'une telle pièce | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE805253 ; | [A]FR1140573 ; | [A]GB2075549 ; | [A]FR2055782 | [A] - revue de metallurgie vol. 74, no. 2, février 1977, j.f.delorme et al.: "Un nouvel acier inoxydable à haute usinabilité page 81,tableau I" |