EP0436760 - Optical molding apparatus and movable base device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Engineering and Shipbuilding Co, Ltd. 6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD 6-4 Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Yoshinao 4-15, Tatsumidai Higashi Ichihara-Shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Nagamori, Shigeru 51-1, Soja Ichigara-Shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
Sato, Katsumi 1986-25, Uruido Ichihara-Shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
Murata, Katsuhide 3-2-2, Wakamiya Ichihara-Shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
Horikiri, Kazuhito 4-7-18, Wada Tamano-Shi Okayama / JP | 06 /
Shirai, Junji 2-3-2, Tsushima Higashi Okayama-Shi Okayama / JP | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100527.2 | 11.01.1990 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436760 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/42 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
Y10T156/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/29] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Formen mit Hilfe von Fotopolymerisation und dafür vorgesehene bewegliche Trägerplatte | [1991/29] | English: | Optical molding apparatus and movable base device therefor | [1991/29] | French: | Appareil de moulage par photopolymérisation et son dispositif de support mobile | [1991/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/15] | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP62040458 [ ]; | JP57151530 [ ]; | [XD]EP0171069 (UVP INC [US]); | [X]WO8806494 (FUDIM EFREM V [US]); | [E]EP0379068 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]); | [X]GB145250 (SHERARD OSBORN COWPER COLES); | [A]EP0338751 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 226 (P-598)[2673], 23rd July 1987; & JP,A,62 040 458 (FUJITSU LTD) 21-02-1987, abstract., & JP62040458 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 256 (M-179)[1134], 15th December 1982; & JP,A,57 151 530 (YAMADA METSUKI KOGYOSHO) 18-09-1982., & JP57151530 A 00000000 |