EP0379910 - Process for the preparation of powdery metal nitrides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mair, Gunther, Dr. Corneliusstrasse 15 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 02 /
Bittler, Knut, Dr. Kardinal-Wendel-Strasse 54 D-6720 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Sterzel, Hans-Josef, Dr. Wasgauring 3 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 04 /
Grammatis, Zafirios Dr. Eckenerstrasse 32 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | [1990/31] | Application number, filing date | 90100660.1 | 13.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | DE19893901725 | 21.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901725 | DE19893924300 | 22.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3924300 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379910 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/06, C01B21/068 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
C01B21/06 (EP);
C01B21/068 (EP);
C01B21/0763 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von pulverförmigen Metallnitriden | [1990/31] | English: | Process for the preparation of powdery metal nitrides | [1990/31] | French: | Procédé de préparation de nitrures métalliques sous forme de poudre | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58091018 ; | [A]US4405589 ; | [A]US4671906 ; | [A]FR2418276 ; | [A]US3959446 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 185 (C-181)(1330) 13 August 1983, & JP-A-58 091018 (DENKI KAGAKU) 30 Mai 1983,, & JP58091018 A 19830813 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 12, September 1984 Columbus, Ohio, USA NIPPON MINING: "Fine titanium nitride." Seite 154; rechte Spalte; ref. no. 93731F |