EP0387490 - Double pivoting head razor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilkinson Sword Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Schützenstrasse 110 42659 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states Wilkinson Sword Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Schützenstrasse 110 D-42659 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Althaus, Wolfgang Hülsberg 94 D-5600 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Coffin, Dave 47 Silver Street Norwich, Norfolk / GB | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100673.4 | 13.01.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19890003182U | 15.03.1989 Original published format: DE 8903182 U | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387490 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387490 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/52 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B26B21/225 (EP,US);
B26B21/521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Doppel-Schwingkopf-Rasierapparat | [1990/38] | English: | Double pivoting head razor | [1990/38] | French: | Rasoir avec tête double oscillante | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.02.1992 | DK | 26.02.1992 | GR | 26.02.1992 | NL | 26.02.1992 | SE | 26.02.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 26.02.1992 | |
DK | 26.02.1992 | ||
NL | 26.02.1992 | ||
SE | 26.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 26.02.1992 | |
NL | 26.02.1992 | ||
SE | 26.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | SE | 26.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | US1455725 [ ] (BUXTON HARTMAN HARRY); | EP0195602 [ ] (WILKINSON SWORD LTD [GB]); | DE3635552 [ ] (KOEPPEN DETLEF [DE]); | US4797998 [ ] (MOTTA VINCENT C [US]) |