EP0393307 - Heating boiler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urbina Casanovas, Pau Juan Sebastian Bach, 20 bis E-08021 Barcelona / ES | [1990/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Körner, Ekkehard Patentanwalt Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100849.0 | 16.01.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | ES19890001334 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: ES 8901334 | [1990/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393307 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393307 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393307 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/00 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
F24H1/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Heizkessel | [1990/43] | English: | Heating boiler | [1990/43] | French: | Chaudière de chauffage | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.1994 | BE | 06.04.1994 | CH | 06.04.1994 | DK | 06.04.1994 | GR | 06.04.1994 | IT | 06.04.1994 | LI | 06.04.1994 | NL | 06.04.1994 | SE | 06.04.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DK | 06.04.1994 | ||
GR | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DK | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DK | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 06.04.1994 | |
LI | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8716241U |