30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
09.02.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
31.01.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] |
25.01.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
18.11.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] |
12.10.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] |
18.02.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] |
25.02.1992 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.1991 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] |
22.02.1991 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
08.09.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] |