EP0379199 - ESD protection structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitterer, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Ringstrasse 25 D-8035 Gauting / DE | 02 /
Soutschek, Ewald, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Cramer-Klett-Strasse 31 B D-8014 Neubiberg / DE | 03 /
Nikutta, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Werinherstrasse 101 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1990/30] | Application number, filing date | 90101020.7 | 18.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | DE19893901668 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901668 | [1990/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379199 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379199 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
H01L27/0251 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | ESD-Schutzstruktur | [1990/30] | English: | ESD protection structure | [1990/30] | French: | Structure de protection ESD | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.04.1994 | AT | 18.01.1995 | [1996/28] |
Former [1995/11] | BE | 27.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6230361 ; | [Y]JP61218163 ; | [A]JP5890780 ; | [A]JP5681966 ; | [A]JP54136279 ; | [A]JP61296773 ; | [A]EP0034929 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2182490 (SGS MICROELETTRONICA SPA) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 209 (E-521)[2656], 7. Juli 1987; & JP-A-62 30 361 (NEC CORP.) 09-02-1987, & JP6230361 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 59 (E-482)[2506], 24. Februar 1987; & JP-A-61 218 163 (HITACHI LTD) 27-09-1986, & JP61218163 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 186 (E-193)[1331], 16. August 1983; & JP-A-58 90 780 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 30-05-1983, & JP5890780 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 149 (E-75)[821], 19. September 1981; & JP-A-56 81 966 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 04-07-1981, & JP5681966 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 155 (E-160), 19. Dezember 1979, Seite 133 E 160; & JP-A-54 136 279 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 23-10-1979, & JP54136279 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRICAL OVERSTRESS/ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, San Diego, California, US, 9.-11. September 1980, Seiten 73-80, IIT Research Institute; J.K. KELLER: "Protection of MOS integrated circuits from destruction by electrostatic discharge" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 165 (E-510)[2612], 27. Mai 1987; & JP-A-61 296 773 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 27-12-1986, & JP61296773 A 00000000 |