EP0379215 - Control system design method and design support apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iino, Yutaka Heartland-yoshizawa 202, Noborito 498, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Shigemasa, Takashi 2-7-4 Higashihongou, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101094.2 | 19.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | JP19890009682 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: JP 968289 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379215 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379215 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379215 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B11/42, G05B13/04 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
G05B17/02 (EP,US);
G05B15/00 (KR);
G05B13/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/30] | Title | German: | Entwurfsverfahren eines Steuerungssystems und Entwurfsunterstützungsgerät | [1990/30] | English: | Control system design method and design support apparatus | [1990/30] | French: | Procédé de conception de système de régulation et appareil d'assistance à la conception | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.06.1994 | IT | 08.06.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 08.06.1994 | |
FR | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | FR | 04.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3618025 (AACHENER FORSCH REGELUNGSTECH [DE]) | [A] - INSTRUMENTS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS. vol. 48, no. 9, September 1975, RADNOR US & Y.C. PAO: "Computer graphics aids Bode analysis" | [A] - CONTROL ENGINEERING. vol. 35, no. 11, November 1988, NEW YORK US page 99 G.J. BLICKLEY: "PID tuning made easy with hand-held computer" | Examination | - INSTRUMENTS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS. vol. 48, no. 9, September 1975, Radnor,US; pages 31-36; S.J.ZITEK & Y.C. PAO: "Computer graphics aids Bode analysis" |